Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 575 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13981 Week
» 66997 Month
» 186524 Year
» 3213377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3725
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
17Sup |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Q4 |
5965 |
|
03/10/1936 |
Q4 |
6135 |
|
11/02/1939 |
Q4 |
5160 |
|
12/04/1941 |
Q4 |
5162 |
|
20/05/1944 |
Q4 |
3203 |
|
13/12/1947 |
|