Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 732 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3875 Week
» 14045 Month
» 291841 Year
» 1176222 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #849
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 87   11/1903
Q4 58   11/05/1907
Q4 1138   13/07/1912
Q4 6138   12/05/1928
B5 5181   31/12/1932
B9 6109   14/07/1934
Q4 6140   23/05/1936
Q4 6139   24/12/1938
Q4 6179   03/08/1940
B5 6071   02/01/1943