Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 226 Today
» 1292 Yesterday
» 2744 Week
» 22389 Month
» 57031 Year
» 1278596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #858
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 142   03/1904
Q4 149   23/06/1908
Q4 59   04/12/1909
Q4 1139   25/09/1915
Q4 1175   13/01/1923