Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 1022 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3121 Week
» 14692 Month
» 262985 Year
» 1147366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1916
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 1074   02/10/1920
Q4 5063   25/12/1926
Q4 5964   04/05/1929
Q4 5956   31/10/1931
Q4 5138   21/07/1934
Q4 5059   20/02/1937