Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 774 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 774 Week
» 18110 Month
» 295906 Year
» 1180287 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #915
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5139   28/12/1929
Q4 5085   14/05/1932
Q4 5064   29/06/1935
Q4 6140   08/10/1938
B9 6113   21/11/1942
B9 6112   03/03/1945
Q4 3213   28/06/1947