Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2234 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20037 Week
» 73053 Month
» 192580 Year
» 3219433 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #906
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
17Sup |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Q4 |
5091 |
|
13/10/1928 |
Q4 |
5140 |
|
14/03/1931 |
Q4 |
5213 |
|
05/08/1933 |
Q4 |
5142 |
|
26/10/1935 |
Q4 |
5064 |
|
19/02/1938 |
Q4 |
5039 |
|
28/09/1940 |
Q4 |
5137 |
|
09/10/1943 |
|