Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 729 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3872 Week
» 14042 Month
» 291838 Year
» 1176219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #138
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5161   14/01/1933
Q4 6142   18/05/1935
Q4 6132   12/02/1938
Q4 5064   12/10/1940
B5 6068   26/06/1943
B5 5184   29/06/1946
Q4 3233   20/09/1947