Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 256 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1482 Week
» 21127 Month
» 55769 Year
» 1277334 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #876
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5070   09/11/1935
Q4 6136   03/09/1938
Q4 5152   08/02/1941
Q4 5064   15/05/1943
Q4 6135   06/10/1945