Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 680 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3325 Week
» 5907 Month
» 270540 Year
» 1492105 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #842
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 65   10/1903
Q4 1143   23/11/1912
Q4 962   09/11/1918
Q4 5150   10/12/1927
Q4 6136   16/01/1932
Q4 5956   14/07/1934
Q4 6176   27/03/1937