Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #525
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 6181   31/05/1924
Q4 5067   21/09/1929
Q4 6137   01/10/1932
Q4 6132   27/07/1935
B5 5186   19/03/1938
B9 6113   26/08/1944