Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1832
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 1132   24/01/1920
Q4 139   09/06/1923
Q4 5068   31/12/1925
Q4 5146   03/11/1928
Q4 5401   21/03/1931
Q4 5961   01/09/1934