Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 396 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7403 Week
» 13537 Month
» 241421 Year
» 1462986 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1817
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 957   01/11/1919
Q4 49   06/05/1922
Q4 6135   31/01/1925
Q4 5070   26/03/1927
Q4 5048   02/11/1929
Q4 5144   03/10/1931