Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1111 Week
» 23617 Month
» 326807 Year
» 1548372 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #847
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 85   11/1903
Q4 142   28/03/1908
Q4 71   20/09/1913
Q4 149   10/11/1917
Q4 6141   28/04/1928
Q4 6176   14/05/1932
Q4 5044   05/01/1935
Q4 5085   25/09/1937