Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1841
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 1138   21/02/1920
Q4 5146   17/05/1924
Q4 5049   31/08/1929
Q4 6175   24/10/1931
Q4 5085   02/03/1935
Q4 6179   11/12/1936