Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1009 Today
» 1245 Yesterday
» 7153 Week
» 38942 Month
» 187707 Year
» 1409272 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #370
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5086   16/02/1924
Q4 6178   28/12/1929
B5 6069   14/01/1933
Q4 6076   10/11/1934
Q4 5143   31/07/1937
Q4 5085   06/04/1940