Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 459 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1798 Week
» 31296 Month
» 368142 Year
» 1589707 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #642
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B5 6068   09/01/1926
B5 5187   26/07/1930
B5 6068   23/01/1932
B9 6110   03/03/1934
B9 6108   10/06/1939
Q4 5085   23/05/1942
Q4 6140   21/10/1944