Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 120 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5213 Week
» 7795 Month
» 272428 Year
» 1493993 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #908
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5062   04/01/1936
Q4 5142   04/12/1937
Q4 6133   22/08/1942
Q4 5085   15/08/1944
Q4 3240   22/02/1947