Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 239 Today
» 1497 Yesterday
» 1736 Week
» 30316 Month
» 30316 Year
» 1251881 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #862
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 146   03/1904
Q4 86   16/11/1907
Q4 1074   02/10/1909
Q4 153   26/12/1914
Q4 963   27/11/1920