Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1327 Today
» 1117 Yesterday
» 1327 Week
» 29907 Month
» 29907 Year
» 1251472 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1822
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 164   29/11/1919
Q4 5964   28/06/1924
Q4 5961   03/05/1930
Q4 5086   27/08/1932