Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 256 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1482 Week
» 21127 Month
» 55769 Year
» 1277334 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1266
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 1136   03/1907
Q4 87   06/08/1910
Q4 150   08/11/1913
Q4 961   13/08/1921
Q4 6137   17/06/1926
Q4 5145   04/08/1928