Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 114 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 114 Week
» 6248 Month
» 234132 Year
» 1455697 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #825
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B5 180   01/1904
B5 184   06/03/1909
B5 185   27/05/1911
B5 183   23/01/1915
Q4 137   04/05/1918