Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 761 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3447 Week
» 4337 Month
» 312318 Year
» 1196699 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #905
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B5 6067   15/09/1928
Q4 5039   11/06/1932
Q4 5137   06/04/1935
Q4 5961   16/01/1937
Q4 6134   12/08/1939
B9 6105   26/07/1941
B9 6110   17/06/1944
Q4 3221   24/01/1948