Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 407 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7414 Week
» 13548 Month
» 241432 Year
» 1462997 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #910
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5164   29/09/1928
B5 5184   20/06/1931
Q4 5965   03/02/1934
Q4 5137   21/11/1936
B5 6072   18/06/1938
B9 6112   02/03/1940
Q4 5159   16/01/1943