Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1102 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 8109 Week
» 14243 Month
» 242127 Year
» 1463692 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #832
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5138   23/07/1927
Q4 5356   11/06/1932
Q4 5140   03/06/1933
Q4 6178   14/03/1936
Q4 5161   13/01/1940
Q4 6132   28/11/1942