Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #47
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 160   22/01/1921
Q4 5957   26/11/1927
Q4 5138   19/03/1932
B5 5186   29/09/1934
Q4 5164   20/06/1936
Q4 5147   31/12/1938