Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 173 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4341 Week
» 19455 Month
» 322645 Year
» 1544210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #918
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5139   19/03/1932
Q4 5356   24/11/1934
Q4 6137   09/10/1937
Q4 6180   12/08/1939
Q4 5152   06/02/1943
Q4 6177   16/06/1945
Q4 3234   06/09/1947