Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 750 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1790 Week
» 11960 Month
» 289756 Year
» 1174137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #640
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5140   10/10/1925
Q4 5142   29/06/1929
Q4 5959   28/02/1931
Q4 5957   24/03/1934
B5 5184   16/05/1936
B5 5180   20/08/1938
B9 6105   20/11/1943