Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 749 Today
» 1106 Yesterday
» 7901 Week
» 27546 Month
» 62188 Year
» 1283753 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1271
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 1141   03/1907
Q4 1137   26/08/1911
Q4 145   10/05/1913
Q4 956   29/05/1915
Q4 1174   11/12/1920