Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1701
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 147   18/08/1917
Q4 1140   02/12/1922
Q4 6175   12/03/1927
Q4 6141   05/03/1932
Q4 6139   15/09/1934