Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1194 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7583 Week
» 28025 Month
» 364871 Year
» 1586436 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #333
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 962   05/01/1924
Q4 5152   04/02/1928
Q4 6181   28/02/1931
Q4 5162   08/04/1933
Q4 5039   12/01/1935
B5 6068   02/10/1937
B5 5187   03/07/1943
B9 6109   02/02/1946