Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 171 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6560 Week
» 27002 Month
» 363848 Year
» 1585413 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #651
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5963   30/01/1926
Q4 6140   02/05/1931
Q4 5163   13/05/1933
Q4 5153   18/01/1936