Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 775 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 775 Week
» 18111 Month
» 295907 Year
» 1180288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #553
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B9 6111   18/10/1924
Q4 6136   26/10/1929
Q4 6133   19/03/1932
B5 6069   06/10/1934
Q4 6136   27/06/1936