Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 43 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7784 Week
» 28226 Month
» 365072 Year
» 1586637 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #495
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5161   01/09/1928
Q4 6174   22/11/1930
B5 6072   30/09/1933
B5 5187   21/09/1935
B5 5181   19/11/1938
Q4 6135   05/04/1941
Q4 5039   04/09/1943