Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1303 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7692 Week
» 28134 Month
» 364980 Year
» 1586545 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #874
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5160   26/10/1935
B5 5187   29/10/1938
B5 6069   27/07/1940
B5 5181   01/01/1944
Q4 3232   15/11/1947