Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 731 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3874 Week
» 14044 Month
» 291840 Year
» 1176221 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1912
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 162   25/12/1920
Q4 5959   06/11/1926
B9 6113   11/04/1931
B5 5185   12/08/1933
B5 6068   06/07/1935