Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 467 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1806 Week
» 31304 Month
» 368150 Year
» 1589715 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #725
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B9 6110   14/08/1926
B5 6072   19/03/1932
B5 5187   09/12/1933
B9 6107   12/10/1935
B5 6067   18/12/1937
Q4 6179   24/10/1942