Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 1023 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7412 Week
» 27854 Month
» 364700 Year
» 1586265 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2303
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1425   19/12/1929
J39 1448   13/08/1934
J39 1470   29/01/1937
J39 1425   22/12/1939
J39 1459   06/11/1941
J39 2734   18/05/1944
J39 4773   03/03/1948