Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3981 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17387 Week
» 70403 Month
» 189930 Year
» 3216783 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #C1834/27532
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
1894 |
|
28/05/1937 |
J39 |
2977 |
|
03/11/1941 |
J39 |
4864 |
|
30/11/1946 |
J39 |
64703 |
|
03/09/1949 |
J39 |
64867 |
|
22/10/1955 |
J39 |
64888 |
|
23/03/1957 |
|