Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 75 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 2309 Week
» 23211 Month
» 23211 Year
» 1244776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2129
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 2713   22/11/1928
J39 1274   16/12/1933
J39 1455   25/04/1936
J39 1464   10/07/1940
J39 1532   19/06/1943
J39 64964   01/09/1948