Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1065 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7455 Week
» 36953 Month
» 373799 Year
» 1595364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2300/27713
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 2783   18/11/1929
J39 2720   24/03/1934
J39 2694   29/05/1937
J39 2973   07/10/1939
J39 2780   26/04/1943
J39 4712   26/10/1946
J39 64769   23/01/1949
J39 64772   03/12/1955