Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 921 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14327 Week
» 67343 Month
» 186870 Year
» 3213723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8585
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
2967 |
|
29/10/1931 |
J39 |
2966 |
|
09/02/1934 |
J39 |
1495 |
|
24/07/1936 |
J39 |
2697 |
|
29/08/1942 |
J39 |
1498 |
|
13/10/1945 |
J39 |
4758 |
|
29/11/1947 |
J39 |
64913 |
|
28/01/1950 |
|