Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1790 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15196 Week
» 68212 Month
» 187739 Year
» 3214592 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8773
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
2716 |
|
25/11/1933 |
J39 |
2717 |
|
04/04/1936 |
J39 |
2712 |
|
23/10/1937 |
J39 |
2784 |
|
31/08/1940 |
J39 |
2962 |
|
01/08/1942 |
J39 |
2963 |
|
16/02/1945 |
J39 |
4716 |
|
30/10/1947 |
|