Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 654 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8993 Week
» 6101 Month
» 113047 Year
» 1334612 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2102/27708
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 2697   09/08/1928
J39 2715   29/09/1933
J39 2704   22/02/1936
J39 1498   06/11/1937
J39 1933   26/06/1943
J39 2723   01/12/1945
J39 64800   25/02/1950
J39 64874   24/12/1954