Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2302
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
2785 |
|
29/11/1929 |
J39 |
2771 |
|
26/03/1932 |
J39 |
1275 |
|
06/05/1936 |
J39 |
1233 |
|
19/03/1938 |
J39 |
1266 |
|
06/04/1940 |
J39 |
2965 |
|
09/01/1943 |
J39 |
2946 |
|
21/04/1945 |
|