Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 339 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5976 Week
» 19080 Month
» 19080 Year
» 1240645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2138
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 2715   26/11/1928
J39 2704   28/10/1933
J39 1259   19/03/1936
J39 1274   13/08/1938
J39 1296   24/05/1941
J39 1295   22/07/1944
J39 4951   25/03/1947