Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #8012
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
1265 |
|
20/02/1932 |
J39 |
1295 |
|
04/08/1934 |
J39 |
2719 |
|
12/12/1936 |
J39 |
2724 |
|
04/11/1939 |
J39 |
2972 |
|
18/08/1943 |
J39 |
2724 |
|
29/09/1945 |
J39 |
64981 |
|
04/06/1949 |
|