Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 198 Today
» 1354 Yesterday
» 4444 Week
» 1552 Month
» 108498 Year
» 1330063 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2205
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 2722   08/04/1929
J39 2692   23/02/1935
J39 2704   21/05/1937
J39 1268   30/09/1939
J39 1933   26/10/1945
J39 64726   24/05/1948