Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 123 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5216 Week
» 7798 Month
» 272431 Year
» 1493996 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #RS118
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1489   13/07/1934
J39 2777   30/08/1938
J39 1274   05/04/1941
J39 2784   18/04/1942
J39 1289   02/09/1944
J39 4952   20/01/1948