Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 160 Today
» 1233 Yesterday
» 5253 Week
» 7835 Month
» 272468 Year
» 1494033 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8009
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1281   28/05/1932
J39 2777   16/05/1936
J39 2967   02/09/1938
J39 1952   28/12/1940
J39 1274   05/08/1944
J39 1488   25/05/1946