Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 549 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 549 Week
» 30047 Month
» 366893 Year
» 1588458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8016
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1298   05/12/1931
J39 1296   14/06/1934
J39 2772   19/12/1936
J39 2720   25/02/1939
J39 2703   18/08/1944